LA HB428 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Becomes Act No. 446.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Becomes Act No. 446.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Extends the jurisdiction of the Board of Tax Appeals to matters concerning the constitutionality of taxes and fees (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Extends the jurisdiction of the Board of Tax Appeals to matters concerning the constitutionality of taxes and fees (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 428 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#902) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 428 FINAL PASSAGE (#759) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 428 AMENDMENT # 2655 BY CLAITOR HB 428 BY DWIGHT (#758) (Y: 2 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 428 FINAL PASSAGE (#252) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 428 FINAL PASSAGE (#759) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 428 AMENDMENT # 2655 BY CLAITOR HB 428 BY DWIGHT (#758) (Y: 2 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 428 FINAL PASSAGE (#252) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Becomes Act No. 446. |
2019-06-07 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2019-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/19. |
2019-05-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |