LA HB426 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Adds members to the Wildlife and Fisheries Commission
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Adds members to the Wildlife and Fisheries Commission
Sponsors
Rep. James Armes [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 426 FINAL PASSAGE (#710) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 426 FINAL PASSAGE (#405) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 426 FINAL PASSAGE (#405) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2013-06-26 | House | Becomes Act No. 437. |
2013-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-14 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2013. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported without amendments (9-0) (Regular). |
2013-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (13-2) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |