LA HB426 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to membership of the LASERS, TRSL, and LSERS boards of trustees (RE NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Provides relative to membership of the LASERS, TRSL, and LSERS boards of trustees (RE NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 426, FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-05-17 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 37. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2011. | |
2011-05-10 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-09 | Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |