LA HB423 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes requirements concerning reports of abortions performed or induced (EN GF EX See Note)
Title
Establishes requirements concerning reports of abortions performed or induced (EN GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 423 ADOPT (#1061) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 423 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1200) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 423 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1115) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 423 FINAL PASSAGE (#900) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 423 FINAL PASSAGE (#414) (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 423 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1200) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 423 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1115) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 423 FINAL PASSAGE (#900) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 423 FINAL PASSAGE (#414) (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 425. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021. |
2021-06-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-10 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2021-06-09 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 78, nays 22. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2021-06-09 | House | Rules suspended. |
2021-06-09 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2021-06-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Emerson, Bagley, and Edmonds. |
2021-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Fred Mills, Boudreaux, and Mizell. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 78, nays 18, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2021-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 14. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-01 | House | Prefiled. |