LA HB423 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the revocation of occupational and professional licenses for failure to pay student loans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the revocation of occupational and professional licenses for failure to pay student loans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably (14-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback