LA HB422 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the fees assessed by the office of debt recovery on delinquent debt that originates from certain criminal fines, fees, and costs (OR DECREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Limits the fees assessed by the office of debt recovery on delinquent debt that originates from certain criminal fines, fees, and costs (OR DECREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |