LA HB418 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 10/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 10/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces severance tax rates on oil and gas produced from inactive wells and orphan wells (EN -$900,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Reduces severance tax rates on oil and gas produced from inactive wells and orphan wells (EN -$900,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 418 ADOPT (#1406) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 418 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1642) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 418 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1122) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 418 FINAL PASSAGE (#554) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Vote on HB 418 FINAL PASSAGE (#82) (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 418 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1642) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 418 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1122) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 418 FINAL PASSAGE (#554) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Vote on HB 418 FINAL PASSAGE (#82) (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | House | Effective date: 10/01/2024. |
2024-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 695. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2024-05-30 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2024-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2024-05-22 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-21 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Foil, Reese, and Wheat. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2024-05-20 | House | House conferees appointed: Beaullieu, Emerson, and Jacob Landry. |
2024-05-20 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2024-05-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-14 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/20/2024. |
2024-05-14 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-14 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-09 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/14/2024. |
2024-05-09 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-08 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/09/2024. |
2024-05-08 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-08 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/08/2024. |
2024-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2024. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |