LA HB417 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Revises Article VII of the Constitution of Louisiana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Revises Article VII of the Constitution of Louisiana

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseRead by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-03HouseReported with amendments (11-0-1).
2021-04-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-21HouseReported with amendments (12-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-04-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB417&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210936
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216211
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220206
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215754
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215881
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217097
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219995
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220929
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210940
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216283
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220231

Bill Comments 750

feedback