LA HB414 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Raises grade point average required to maintain eligibility for the Taylor Opportunity Program for Students (TOPS) Opportunity Award (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Raises grade point average required to maintain eligibility for the Taylor Opportunity Program for Students (TOPS) Opportunity Award (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Notice removed |
2018-04-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18. |
2018-04-12 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-12 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported favorably (8-5-1). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |