LA HB413 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-16-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Designates a portion of North Causeway Boulevard in St. Tammany Parish as the "Captain Vincent N. Liberto, Jr., Memorial Overpass"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of North Causeway Boulevard in St. Tammany Parish as the "Captain Vincent N. Liberto, Jr., Memorial Overpass"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 413 FINAL PASSAGE (#541) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 413 FINAL PASSAGE (#31) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-04HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 75.
2021-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
2021-05-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-24SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-04-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-20HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2021.
2021-04-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-14HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-04-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB413&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210833
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214154
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228900
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231958
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212909
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213958
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210846
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214214
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237360
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215468
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228649

Bill Comments

feedback