LA HB411 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-23-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to hunting and fishing license fees for Purple Heart recipients (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to hunting and fishing license fees for Purple Heart recipients (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Neil Riser [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]
Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]
Rep. Michael Echols [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Les Farnum [R]
Rep. Gabe Firment [R]Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Larry Frieman [R]
Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. John Illg [R]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]
Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Danny McCormick [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]
Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]
Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Richard Nelson [R]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Charles Owen [R]
Rep. Tammy Phelps [D]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Troy Romero [R]
Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Larry Selders [D]
Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]
Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]
Sen. Mark Abraham [R]Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Troy Carter [D]Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]
Sen. Heather Cloud [R]Sen. Patrick Connick [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Michael Fesi [R]
Sen. Franklin Foil [R]Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]
Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]
Sen. Patrick McMath [R]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]
Sen. John Morris [R]Sen. Rogers Pope [R]Sen. Mike Reese [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]
Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Glen Womack [R]

Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 411 CO-AUTHORS (#683) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 411 FINAL PASSAGE (#682) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 411 2/3 vote (#681) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 411 PERMISSION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#688) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 411 FINAL PASSAGE (#257) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 190.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-31SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-31HouseNotice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-31SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-31HouseBy a vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2020-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-21HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2020-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2020-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB411&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162344
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172113
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178615
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181923
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162365
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164780
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172209
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172314
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179338
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175018
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178342
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178503
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178505
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178508

Bill Comments

feedback