LA HB400 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an extension of court costs collected by the Civil District Court for the parish of Orleans (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)
Title
Provides for an extension of court costs collected by the Civil District Court for the parish of Orleans (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 400 FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 400 FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 400 FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2020. |
2020-06-04 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 27. |
2020-05-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-03-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/20. |
2020-03-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |