LA HB4 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to emergency declarations (Items #1, 2, and 28)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to emergency declarations (Items #1, 2, and 28)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on HB 4 FINAL PASSAGE (#19) (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-14SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-10-07SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-06SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-10-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseReported with amendments (10-5).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2020-09-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2020-09-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB4&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1188671
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190358
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190534
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190082
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190355
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190485
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190412
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1188672
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190374
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190489

Bill Comments

feedback