LA HB398 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Becomes HB 840.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Becomes HB 840.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes requirements for approval of capital outlay priority changes and project descriptions
Title
Changes requirements for approval of capital outlay priority changes and project descriptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Becomes HB 840. |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported by substitute (11-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |