LA HB395 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to a special fund for the purpose of funding early childhood education (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to a special fund for the purpose of funding early childhood education (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 395 FINAL PASSAGE (#137) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/02/19.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB395&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121451
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126938
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130561
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128086
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135354
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121468
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127160
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130691
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132511
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135834
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130528

Bill Comments

feedback