LA HB393 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: May 23 in John J. Hainkel, Jr. Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the school facilities preservation and systemwide needs programs in certain school districts (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the school facilities preservation and systemwide needs programs in certain school districts (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 393 FINAL PASSAGE (#294) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-14HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB393&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121449
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130123
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134105
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127824
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129945
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130971
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121491
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122715
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130309
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130623
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134155
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134990
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134081

Bill Comments

feedback