LA HB392 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to Medicaid and private insurance coverage for perimenopausal and menopausal care (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to Medicaid and private insurance coverage for perimenopausal and menopausal care (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 392 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1491) (Y: 71 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 392 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1491) (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 392 FINAL PASSAGE (#917) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 392 FINAL PASSAGE (#244) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 392 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1491) (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 392 FINAL PASSAGE (#917) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 392 FINAL PASSAGE (#244) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-25 | House | Becomes Act No. 784 without the Governor's signature. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 71, nays 14, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 19. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |