LA HB392 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: May 27 @ 1:30 pm in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2018-2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2018-2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 392 FINAL PASSAGE (#246) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-09HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-08HouseMade Special Order of the day No. 7 for 05/09/19.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-08HouseRules suspended.
2019-05-08HouseReported with amendments (23-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB392&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121462
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132472
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132978
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133035
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128108
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129867
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132386
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132977
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132881
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121490
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132867
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133127
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133024

Bill Comments

feedback