LA HB392 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits insurers from combining a higher classified public fire protection area with a lower classified public fire protection area for the purpose of determining insurance rates for both districts
Title
Prohibits insurers from combining a higher classified public fire protection area with a lower classified public fire protection area for the purpose of determining insurance rates for both districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 392 FINAL PASSAGE (#458) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 392 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 392 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-03 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 61. |
2017-05-25 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |