LA HB391 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-24-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the certification of veteran-owned businesses (EGF INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the certification of veteran-owned businesses (EGF INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Franklin Foil [R]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]
Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]
Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]
Rep. Patrick Connick [R]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]
Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]
Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Cameron Henry [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]
Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Mike Huval [R]
Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Robert Johnson [D]
Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Terry Landry [D]
Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]
Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]
Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. John Morris [R]Rep. Stuart Moss [R]
Rep. Barbara Norton [D]Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Stephen Pugh [R]
Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Scott Simon [R]
Rep. Patricia Smith [D]Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]
Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 391 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#807) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 391 FINAL PASSAGE (#560) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 391 FINAL PASSAGE (#49) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-06HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 160.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-05-31HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/02/19.
2019-05-30HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-29SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-23SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-04-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2019-04-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-24HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-16HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB391&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121461
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124915
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141368
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143693
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124102
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124871
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138202
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139466
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140852
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141250
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121494
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124673
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125191
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126484
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127107
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139279

Bill Comments

feedback