LA HB390 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for fox pens as part of Louisiana's folklife heritage
Title
Provides for fox pens as part of Louisiana's folklife heritage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 390 FINAL PASSAGE (#1324) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 390 FINAL PASSAGE (#859) (Y: 69 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 390 AMENDMENT # 4992 BY SCHEXNAYDER MOTION TO ADOPT (#858) (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 390 AMENDMENT # 4186 BY LANDRY N. MOTION TO ADOPT (#646) (Y: 47 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 390 FINAL PASSAGE (#859) (Y: 69 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 390 AMENDMENT # 4992 BY SCHEXNAYDER MOTION TO ADOPT (#858) (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 390 AMENDMENT # 4186 BY LANDRY N. MOTION TO ADOPT (#646) (Y: 47 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2014. |
2014-06-09 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 552. |
2014-05-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2014-05-12 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014. |
2014-05-06 | House | Notice given. |
2014-04-28 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2014-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014. |
2014-04-23 | House | Notice given. |
2014-04-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/01/2014. |
2014-03-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2014-02-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2014-02-25 | House | Prefiled. |