LA HB39 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Signed by the President of the Senate on 10/16/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2020-2021 (Item #11)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2020-2021 (Item #11)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 39 ADOPT (#126) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-15 - House - House Vote on HB 39 MOTION TO ADOPT (#161) (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 39 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#112) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 39 FINAL PASSAGE (#75) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on HB 39 FINAL PASSAGE (#16) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 10/16/2020.
2020-10-16HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-10-16HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-15HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-10-15SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-10-15SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-10-15HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 13. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-10-15HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-15HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-10-15SenateConference committee report received.
2020-10-15HouseNotice Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
2020-10-15HouseThe House recommitted the bill to Conference Committee.
2020-10-15SenateNotice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
2020-10-15SenateThe Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
2020-10-15HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-10-15HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-14HouseConference committee report was considered and returned to the calendar.
2020-10-14HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-14HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2020-10-14SenateConference committee report received.
2020-10-14SenateRules suspended.
2020-10-14HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-10-14SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, White, and Tarver.
2020-10-14SenateNotice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-10-13HouseHouse conferees appointed: Zeringue, Schexnayder, and Thompson.
2020-10-13HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-10-13HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-13HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-10-13SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-12SenateRead by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for 10/13.
2020-10-12SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-12SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-10-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-09-30HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20.
2020-09-30HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-09-29HouseReported with amendments (18-0).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB39&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189333
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189549
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190555
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192717
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189476
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189519
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190430
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189698
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189533
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191932
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191809
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191808
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191807
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191773
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192167
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192427
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192376
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189334
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189670
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190575
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191992
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192871
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192213
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192891
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192894

Bill Comments

feedback