LA HB39 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 49. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 49. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the election districts for members of congress (Item #3)
Title
Provides relative to the election districts for members of congress (Item #3)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 39, AMENDMENT # 42 BY JACKSON M., MOTION TO ADOPT (#61) (Y: 20 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 39, FINAL PASSAGE (#71) (Y: 47 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 39, AMENDMENT # 46B BY RICHARD, MOTION TO ADOPT (#60) (Y: 47 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2011-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 39, FINAL PASSAGE (#71) (Y: 47 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 39, AMENDMENT # 46B BY RICHARD, MOTION TO ADOPT (#60) (Y: 47 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 49. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-04-04 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-04-04 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/4/2011. | |
2011-03-31 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-03-31 | Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-31 | Reported with amendments (11-8) (Regular). | |
2011-03-27 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-03-27 | Read by title. |