LA HB389 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to emergency suspension of legal deadlines
Title
Provides relative to emergency suspension of legal deadlines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 389 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1689) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 ADOPT (#1419) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 389 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1544) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 FINAL PASSAGE (#1258) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 AMENDMENT # 3759 BY CONNICK HB 389 BY PRESSLY (#1257) (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Vote on HB 389 FINAL PASSAGE (#71) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 ADOPT (#1419) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 389 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1544) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 FINAL PASSAGE (#1258) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 AMENDMENT # 3759 BY CONNICK HB 389 BY PRESSLY (#1257) (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Vote on HB 389 FINAL PASSAGE (#71) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 469. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Connick, and Robert Mills. |
2022-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Pressly, Gregory Miller, and Seabaugh. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 76, nays 21, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-03-24 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2022. |
2022-03-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |