LA HB389 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for naming the supreme court building after Pascal F. Calogero, Jr.
Title
Provides for naming the supreme court building after Pascal F. Calogero, Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 FINAL PASSAGE (#808) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 CO-AUTHORS (#807) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 389 FINAL PASSAGE (#292) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 CO-AUTHORS (#807) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 389 FINAL PASSAGE (#292) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 429. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |