LA HB388 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the inspection of assessment lists and the notification and review of property tax assessments by the board of review in Orleans Parish (EG +$37,000 LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the inspection of assessment lists and the notification and review of property tax assessments by the board of review in Orleans Parish (EG +$37,000 LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/16/2013. |
2013-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported favorably (17-0) (Local and Consent). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |