LA HB38 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for school board information to be accessible on the Louisiana Fiscal Transparency Website known as Louisiana Checkbook (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for school board information to be accessible on the Louisiana Fiscal Transparency Website known as Louisiana Checkbook (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 ADOPT (#1064) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 38 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1194) (Y: 76 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 38 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1086) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#859) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 AMENDMENT # 3543 BY BOUIE HB 38 BY EDMONDS (#858) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#219) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-07-20HouseVeto message read. Lies over under the rules.
2021-07-01HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 20 yeas and 14 nays.
2021-06-10SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-09HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 76, nays 27. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2021-06-09HouseConference Committee report received.
2021-06-09HouseRules suspended.
2021-06-08SenateConference committee report received.
2021-06-08SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-08SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: White, Bouie, and Talbot.
2021-06-08SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2021-06-08HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Edmonds, Zeringue, and Bacala.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-01SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-04HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-04HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-29HouseNotice given.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably (19-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-03-05HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2021.
2021-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB38&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1201411
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217135
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220902
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234360
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219978
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230212
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229997
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232342
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1201416
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216912
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217470
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218128
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220939
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221602
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230535
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230802
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230849
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232749
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232739
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233782
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234830
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236614
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220881
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232385
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232389
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233239
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234051
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234312

Bill Comments

feedback