LA HB38 | 2016 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-19 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 55. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-19 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 55. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the amount of the individual income tax deduction for excess federal itemized personal deductions (Item #42) (EG +$88,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Reduces the amount of the individual income tax deduction for excess federal itemized personal deductions (Item #42) (EG +$88,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-19 - House - House Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#32) (Y: 47 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 55. Failed to pass. |
2016-06-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-06-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/19/2016. |
2016-06-16 | House | Notice given. |
2016-06-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-06-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/16/2016. |
2016-06-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported with amendments (10-9). |
2016-06-06 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-06-06 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-06-06 | House | Prefiled. |