LA HB378 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date: 02/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date: 02/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to registration and voting by a person with a felony conviction
Title
Provides relative to registration and voting by a person with a felony conviction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 378 FINAL PASSAGE (#572) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 378 FINAL PASSAGE (#197) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 378 FINAL PASSAGE (#197) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | House | Effective date: 02/01/2022. |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 127. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-27 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021. |
2021-04-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported with amendments (12-2). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-04-01 | House | Prefiled. |