LA HB372 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-03 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the violation of municipal building code ordinances and regulations in the city of New Orleans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the violation of municipal building code ordinances and regulations in the city of New Orleans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 372 FINAL PASSAGE (#956) (Y: 53 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-06-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-03HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-24HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
2021-05-20HouseNotice given.
2021-05-20HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021.
2021-05-17HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-13HouseReported with amendments (9-3).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2021-04-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback