LA HB372 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts the Omnibus Premium Reduction Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the Omnibus Premium Reduction Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 372 FINAL PASSAGE (#27) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 372 AMENDMENT # 1427 BY MILLER G. MOTION TO ADOPT (#26) (Y: 9 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2019-04-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/23/19.
2019-04-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-15HouseReported with amendments (5-2).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB372&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121375
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124461
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126715
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124007
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124403
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126597
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126595
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126498
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126304
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126086
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126625
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121429
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124560
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126785
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126676

Bill Comments

feedback