LA HB370 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Establishes certain property tax exemptions for capital investment projects (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Establishes certain property tax exemptions for capital investment projects (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021.
2021-05-11HouseNotice given.
2021-05-11HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-11HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-04HouseNotice given.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-04HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-29HouseNotice given.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported without amendments (12-0-1).
2021-04-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-21HouseReported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback