LA HB369 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for a flat tax on individual income and eliminates the mandatory income tax deduction for federal income taxes paid for purposes of computing income taxes (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for a flat tax on individual income and eliminates the mandatory income tax deduction for federal income taxes paid for purposes of computing income taxes (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-11HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-03HouseNotice given.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-03HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
2021-04-29HouseNotice given.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported with amendments (15-0-1).
2021-04-22HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably (14-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB369&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210482
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215831
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217260
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217113
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217227
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210513
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212454
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216169
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216338
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217512
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217780

Bill Comments

feedback