LA HB367 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires teachers or other school employees placed on administrative leave during a law enforcement investigation to remain on leave at least until the completion of the investigation by the law enforcement agency
Title
Requires teachers or other school employees placed on administrative leave during a law enforcement investigation to remain on leave at least until the completion of the investigation by the law enforcement agency
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Brass [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-05 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2022. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |