LA HB367 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes a fee for the issuance and renewal of driver's licenses and dedicates the revenue to the Transportation Trust Fund
Title
Imposes a fee for the issuance and renewal of driver's licenses and dedicates the revenue to the Transportation Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House. | |
2010-03-31 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB367 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=682881 |