LA HB364 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - The amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 23 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the compensation of school bus operators (RE INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the compensation of school bus operators (RE INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 364 FINAL PASSAGE (#923) (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 364 FINAL PASSAGE (#229) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateThe amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 23 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-06SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-06SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-06-02SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-05HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB364&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210008
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218252
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221377
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219010
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232237
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210019
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216913
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218594
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218845
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221697
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222361
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221317
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232753

Bill Comments

feedback