LA HB358 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the Jan. 1, 2015, sunset date for issuance of sound recording investor tax credits and provides a threshold for Louisiana residents (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Removes the Jan. 1, 2015, sunset date for issuance of sound recording investor tax credits and provides a threshold for Louisiana residents (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Abramson [D] | Sen. Wesley Bishop [D] | Rep. Robert Johnson [D] | Rep. Harold Ritchie [D] |
Rep. Julie Stokes [R] | Rep. Patrick Williams [D] | Rep. Thomas Willmott [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 358 FINAL PASSAGE (#919) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 358 FINAL PASSAGE (#402) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 358 FINAL PASSAGE (#402) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 385. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 8. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2013. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |