LA HB357 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires reporting of certain information relating to minors who undergo abortions (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Requires reporting of certain information relating to minors who undergo abortions (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 357 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1107) (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 357 FINAL PASSAGE (#952) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 357 FINAL PASSAGE (#409) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 357 FINAL PASSAGE (#952) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 357 FINAL PASSAGE (#409) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-29 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 482. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 73, nays 28, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |