LA HB357 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Grambling State University to redesignate Stadium and Facilities Drive, on the campus of Grambling State University, as "Doug Williams Drive"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Grambling State University to redesignate Stadium and Facilities Drive, on the campus of Grambling State University, as "Doug Williams Drive"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 357 FINAL PASSAGE (#46) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-24HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably (18-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback