LA HB357 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Grambling State University to redesignate Stadium and Facilities Drive, on the campus of Grambling State University, as "Doug Williams Drive"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Grambling State University to redesignate Stadium and Facilities Drive, on the campus of Grambling State University, as "Doug Williams Drive"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 357 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#893) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 357 FINAL PASSAGE (#744) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 357 FINAL PASSAGE (#46) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseEffective date: 06/11/2019.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 217.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-24HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably (18-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB357&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121358
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124949
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142115
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144133
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134148
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140807
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140363
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141651
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141961
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121409
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125150
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134998
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127087
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140844

Bill Comments

feedback