LA HB351 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Effective date: 01/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to voting by persons in a nursing home

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to voting by persons in a nursing home

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 351 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1136) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 351 FINAL PASSAGE (#905) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 351 FINAL PASSAGE (#363) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseEffective date: 01/01/2019.
2018-05-28HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 546.
2018-05-18HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18.
2018-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-09SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-30SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-26SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-25SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-12SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-11SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-10HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18.
2018-04-05HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-04HouseReported favorably (7-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB351&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071383
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082820
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085192
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097690
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102754
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084871
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090890
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095309
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097553
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071428
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082903
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085224
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1108465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085183
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094820

Bill Comments

feedback