LA HB349 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits requiring vaccination verification or immunity status for certain transactions or for inclusion on a driver's license or special identification card

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits requiring vaccination verification or immunity status for certain transactions or for inclusion on a driver's license or special identification card

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 349 FINAL PASSAGE (#896) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 349 FINAL PASSAGE (#144) (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-02SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-05-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB349&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209945
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217507
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219298
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232744
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216839
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217234
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219139
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231138
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209951
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217598
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219373
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219208
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232596

Bill Comments 750

feedback