LA HB349 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to group insurance expenses of the clerk of court in St. Mary Parish
Title
Provides relative to group insurance expenses of the clerk of court in St. Mary Parish
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2018-04-05 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2018-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/06/18. |
2018-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |