LA HB347 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Effective date: 01/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the coverage of diagnostic imaging at the same level of coverage as screening mammograms (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the coverage of diagnostic imaging at the same level of coverage as screening mammograms (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Neil Abramson [D]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]
Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]
Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]Rep. Gary Carter [D]
Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]
Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]
Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]
Rep. John Guinn [R]Rep. Jimmy Harris [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Cameron Henry [R]
Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]
Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]
Rep. Robert Johnson [D]Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Terry Landry [D]
Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]
Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]
Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Pat Moore [D]
Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Stephen Pugh [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]
Rep. Jerome Richard [I]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Patricia Smith [D]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]
Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]
Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. Conrad Appel [R]
Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Norby Chabert [R]
Sen. Yvonne Dorsey-Colomb [D]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Jack Donahue [R]Sen. Dale Erdey [R]
Sen. James Fannin [R]Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]
Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]
Sen. John Milkovich [D]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Neil Riser [R]
Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. John Smith [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]
Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Mack White [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 347 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#918) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 347 FINAL PASSAGE (#803) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 347 CO-AUTHORS (#802) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 347 FINAL PASSAGE (#386) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseEffective date: 01/01/2021.
2019-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 119.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-03HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-23SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-23SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2019-05-22SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-16HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-16HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
2019-05-14HouseNotice given.
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB347&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121345
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130162
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135161
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142166
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143562
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128135
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130081
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133548
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136680
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138116
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141343
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142037
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121373
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126403
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130327
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133888
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135198
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136775
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142934
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135140
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141058
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141059

Bill Comments

feedback