LA HB346 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 29, nays 64. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 29, nays 64. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to the political activity restrictions applicable to classified employees of a fire and police civil service system
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to the political activity restrictions applicable to classified employees of a fire and police civil service system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 346 FINAL PASSAGE (#395) (Y: 29 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 29, nays 64. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |