LA HB345 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of the Louisiana National Guard unless war is declared or the governor approves
Title
Prohibits the use of the Louisiana National Guard unless war is declared or the governor approves
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |