LA HB345 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Effective date: 01/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for coverage for breast and ovarian cancer susceptibility screening (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for coverage for breast and ovarian cancer susceptibility screening (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 345 FINAL PASSAGE (#558) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 345 FINAL PASSAGE (#382) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseEffective date: 01/01/2020.
2019-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 118.
2019-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-30HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-05-29SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-23SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-16HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
2019-05-14HouseNotice given.
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB345&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120838
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130158
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135143
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139625
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143561
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124191
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130073
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130668
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120848
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125397
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130303
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133648
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135167
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136580
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140851
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1146316
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135133
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139270

Bill Comments

feedback