LA HB344 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date: June 24, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date: June 24, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a ten-day grace period for paying condominium assessments
Title
Establishes a ten-day grace period for paying condominium assessments
Sponsors
Rep. Nita Hutter [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 344, MOTION TO CONCUR (#579) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 344, FINAL PASSAGE (#416) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 344, FINAL PASSAGE (#179) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 344, FINAL PASSAGE (#416) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 344, FINAL PASSAGE (#179) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Effective date: June 24, 2011. | |
2011-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 180. | |
2011-06-16 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-31 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-26 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-25 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2011-05-17 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2011. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-10 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |