LA HB343 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Becomes HB 706.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Becomes HB 706.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to wine producers
Title
Provides relative to wine producers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Becomes HB 706. |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported by substitute (9-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |