LA HB343 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the statutory rights of teachers
Title
Provides relative to the statutory rights of teachers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 343 FINAL PASSAGE (#451) (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 343 FINAL PASSAGE (#362) (Y: 48 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 343 LAY ON THE TABLE (#361) (Y: 40 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 343 FINAL PASSAGE (#362) (Y: 48 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 343 LAY ON THE TABLE (#361) (Y: 40 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 36. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/18. |
2018-04-13 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 35. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |